NY A10251 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - signed chap.260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - signed chap.260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the incorporation of certain businesses for the purpose of practicing professional geology.
Title
Relates to the incorporation of certain businesses for the purpose of practicing professional geology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | signed chap.260 |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1029 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7552 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.202 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.202 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07552 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10251