NY A10248 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the Wayne county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Wayne.
Title
Relates to authorizing the Wayne county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Wayne.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8092 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.346 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08092 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.385