NY A10244 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9371
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9371
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a school, church, synagogue or other place of worship.
Title
Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a school, church, synagogue or other place of worship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s9371 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.581 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S09371 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.353