NY A10240 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Donald Kane of the village of Mohawk, county of Herkimer to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Mohawk police department.
Title
Authorizes Donald Kane of the village of Mohawk, county of Herkimer to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Mohawk police department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9112 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.742 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09112 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.543