NY A10239 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to releasing individuals charged with a crime under non-monetary bail conditions in order to receive mental health screening or be admitted to a hospital as a result of a mental illness which is likely to result in harm to such individual or others.
Title
Relates to releasing individuals charged with a crime under non-monetary bail conditions in order to receive mental health screening or be admitted to a hospital as a result of a mental illness which is likely to result in harm to such individual or others.
Sponsors
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.505 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.505 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | print number 10239a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S09429 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 9429A