NY A10236 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New York state decommissioning oversight boards for nuclear power plants; defines terms; provides that a New York state decommissioning oversight board shall be established for a state retiring facility within one month after such facility's future closure is noticed to the nuclear regulatory commission; establishes an eleven member board; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes New York state decommissioning oversight boards for nuclear power plants; defines terms; provides that a New York state decommissioning oversight board shall be established for a state retiring facility within one month after such facility's future closure is noticed to the nuclear regulatory commission; establishes an eleven member board; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.293 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.293 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 10236b |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | print number 10236a |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2020-03-27 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S08154 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES