NY A10234 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides clarification for the creation of valid statutory short form and other powers of attorney by clarifying when a principal and agent sign a power of attorney and its effectiveness.
Title
Provides clarification for the creation of valid statutory short form and other powers of attorney by clarifying when a principal and agent sign a power of attorney and its effectiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9209 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.639 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.639 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S09209 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.784