NY A10227 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to medical malpractice insurers.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to medical malpractice insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s8902 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.390 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.390 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S08902 (Same As) 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.637