NY A10226 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Clinton to reinstate Aaron Heroux as a deputy sheriff, notwithstanding that such reinstatement will occur more than 1 year after leaving such position.
Title
Authorizes the county of Clinton to reinstate Aaron Heroux as a deputy sheriff, notwithstanding that such reinstatement will occur more than 1 year after leaving such position.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.150 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1789 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7564 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.307 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.307 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07564 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10226