NY A10221 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8093a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8093a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions of the public health law and the social services law.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions of the public health law and the social services law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s8093a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.117 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.117 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | print number 10221a |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08093 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.106