NY A10211 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain time frames for action by insurers relating to requests for unclaimed life insurance through the lost policy finder.
Title
Amends certain time frames for action by insurers relating to requests for unclaimed life insurance through the lost policy finder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07393 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to insurance