NY A10206 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - substituted by s8136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from Chabad Lubavitch Chai Center, Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from Chabad Lubavitch Chai Center, Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s8136
2020-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.120
2020-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.120
2020-06-09Assemblyreported
2020-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-06Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2020-03-24Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S08136 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback