NY A10206 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from Chabad Lubavitch Chai Center, Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from Chabad Lubavitch Chai Center, Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.8 |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.163 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.120 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a10206 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.733 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s8136 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.120 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.120 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08136 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.8