NY A10205 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the village of Cold Spring, in Putnam County, to impose a hotel and motel tax of up to five percent.
Title
Permits the village of Cold Spring, in Putnam County, to impose a hotel and motel tax of up to five percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.433 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1865 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8996 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.579 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.579 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08996 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10205