NY A10205 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.396
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the provision of services to out-of-state school districts by boards of cooperative educational services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the provision of services to out-of-state school districts by boards of cooperative educational services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.396
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1476
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7120A
2012-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.363
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.363
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-14Assemblyprint number 10205a
2012-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2012-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-11Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S07120 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10205A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback