NY A10204 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Bushnell's Basin Fire Department, in the town of Perinton, county of Monroe from the forty-five percent limit on non-resident members.
Title
Exempts the Bushnell's Basin Fire Department, in the town of Perinton, county of Monroe from the forty-five percent limit on non-resident members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.308 |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1196 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9030 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.273 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09030 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10204