NY A10203 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage bluefish.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage bluefish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.147 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1342 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7308 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.878 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07308 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10203