NY A10196 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Rushford, county of Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Title
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Rushford, county of Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.740 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.740 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09046 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT