NY A10184 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contracts for transportation of children in the county and city of New York.
Title
Relates to contracts for transportation of children in the county and city of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7189 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.459 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07189 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.424