NY A10179 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.395
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to adoptions from a foreign country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to adoptions from a foreign country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.395
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1392
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7548
2012-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.127
2012-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.127
2012-06-11Assemblyreported
2012-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-17Assemblyprint number 10179a
2012-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2012-05-10Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S07548 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10179A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback