NY A10175 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits The Advocare Foundation, Ltd. to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits The Advocare Foundation, Ltd. to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.345 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | print number 10175a |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07915 (Same As) 2018-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 7915A