NY A10167 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines the duties and renames the office of minority health to the office of health equity.
Title
Redefines the duties and renames the office of minority health to the office of health equity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.93 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.93 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08155 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES