NY A10160 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits auto lenders from remotely disabling a vehicle without first giving notice of the disabling to the debtor.
Title
Prohibits auto lenders from remotely disabling a vehicle without first giving notice of the disabling to the debtor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s2484 |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.931 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02484 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.312