NY A10153 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.294
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.294
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of labor to use electronic storage technology to store public records, papers, documents and matters required by law to be recorded.
Title
Authorizes the department of labor to use electronic storage technology to store public records, papers, documents and matters required by law to be recorded.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.294 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1398 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9095 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.265 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S09095 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10153