NY A10151 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a designating petition for the June 2020 primary election shall be filed with the appropriate board of elections on March 17 through March 20, 2020; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that a designating petition for the June 2020 primary election shall be filed with the appropriate board of elections on March 17 through March 20, 2020; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.24 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-03-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.13 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | substituted for a10151 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | referred to labor |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.618 |
2020-03-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | substituted by s8058 |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.13 |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | reference changed to labor |
2020-03-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08058 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.24