NY A10138 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to chapter allowing volunteers to take a leave of absence for emergencies.
Title
Makes technical corrections to chapter allowing volunteers to take a leave of absence for emergencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.376 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1587 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7877 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.582 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.582 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07877 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10138