NY A10137 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of securing orders and makes conforming changes related thereto; release under non-monetary conditions; electronic monitoring; requires a rehearing after five days in custody for certain principals.
Title
Relates to the issuance of securing orders and makes conforming changes related thereto; release under non-monetary conditions; electronic monitoring; requires a rehearing after five days in custody for certain principals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 10137a |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.930 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |