NY A10131 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Chabad at Stony Brook, Inc. to submit a retroactive application for a real property tax exemption to the assessor of town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, for a parcel at 3 Galloway Court.
Title
Authorizes Chabad at Stony Brook, Inc. to submit a retroactive application for a real property tax exemption to the assessor of town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, for a parcel at 3 Galloway Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.151 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1379 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8126 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.929 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08126 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10131