NY A10129 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7601
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7601
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for enhanced protection of water supplies from and emergency planning for terrorism and cyber terrorism attacks.
Title
Provides for enhanced protection of water supplies from and emergency planning for terrorism and cyber terrorism attacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7601 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.503 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07601 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.516