NY A10123 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To grant licensure to foreign trained dentists who are employed as a full-time faculty member at a NYS dental school.
Title
Amends chapter 537 of the laws of 2008, amending the education law relating to a restricted dental faculty license, in relation to extending the expiration of such chapter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-17 | signed chap.499 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-15 | 3RD READING CAL.904 | |
2010-06-15 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7810 | |
2010-03-22 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-03-22 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-18 | advanced to third reading cal.747 | |
2010-03-16 | reported | |
2010-03-05 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07810 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10123