NY A10119 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs empire state development to publish and maintain a list of available programs to assist small businesses.
Title
Directs empire state development to publish and maintain a list of available programs to assist small businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.44 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.339 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.199 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | substituted for a10119 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | referred to small business |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.481 |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7350 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.199 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.199 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S07350 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.44