NY A10116 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to including members of the fire investigation unit in the city of Schenectady as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to including members of the fire investigation unit in the city of Schenectady as peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatetabled
2012-12-17Senatevetoed memo.175
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1157
2012-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7241
2012-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2012-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2012-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.676
2012-05-22Assemblyreported
2012-05-07Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S07241 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10116

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback