NY A10113 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a petition in a summary proceeding to recover possession of real property in the city of Albany to allege proof of compliance with local laws requiring rental residential property registration and licensure.
Title
Requires a petition in a summary proceeding to recover possession of real property in the city of Albany to allege proof of compliance with local laws requiring rental residential property registration and licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.615 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1697 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9036 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.575 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.575 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S09036 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10113