NY A10107 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a residential-commercial exemption program in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a residential-commercial exemption program in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.394
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1442
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7424
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.492
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.492
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-04Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S07424 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10107

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback