NY A10096 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-26 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-26 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the enactment by the legislature of a code of corporate responsibility; requires all corporations formed under laws of other states doing business in this state to pay registration fees and taxes in New York and adhere to the code of corporate responsibility; includes limited liability companies and other entities having corporate powers within the definition of "corporation".
Title
Requires the enactment by the legislature of a code of corporate responsibility; requires all corporations formed under laws of other states doing business in this state to pay registration fees and taxes in New York and adhere to the code of corporate responsibility; includes limited liability companies and other entities having corporate powers within the definition of "corporation".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-26 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |