NY A10082 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7415c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the leasing of companion animals; prohibits using companion animals as security for a contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the leasing of companion animals; prohibits using companion animals as security for a contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted by s7415c
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.180
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.180
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-25Assemblyprint number 10082b
2018-05-25Assemblyamend and recommit to agriculture
2018-04-23Assemblyprint number 10082a
2018-04-23Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to agriculture
2018-03-14Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S07415 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10082
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10082A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10082B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10082&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback