NY A10070 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hudson River Black River Regulating District to undertake a comprehensive study regarding the beneficiaries of the district and real property tax apportionments to establish a standard methodology for the determination of any future apportionment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Hudson River Black River Regulating District to undertake a comprehensive study regarding the beneficiaries of the district and real property tax apportionments to establish a standard methodology for the determination of any future apportionment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2055
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7957A
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.341
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.341
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-05Assemblyprint number 10070a
2018-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2018-03-14Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S07957 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10070A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10070
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10070A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10070#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback