NY A10059 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness for two years authorizing the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Title
Extends the effectiveness for two years authorizing the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7966 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1032 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07966 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.346