NY A10049 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency and extending the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency and extending the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.327 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1469 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6900 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.609 |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06900 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10049