NY A10033 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - approval memo.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes an occupancy tax in the village of Mount Kisco.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes an occupancy tax in the village of Mount Kisco.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31Senateapproval memo.29
2016-12-31Senatesigned chap.511
2016-12-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2016-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-17SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2016-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.2012
2016-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8161
2016-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2016-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2016-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-05-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.854
2016-05-25Assemblyreported
2016-05-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S08161 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10033

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback