NY A10028 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows New York sire stakes eligibility for foals sired by New York state stallions, either in-state or out-of-state.
Title
Allows New York sire stakes eligibility for foals sired by New York state stallions, either in-state or out-of-state.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | vetoed memo.35 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1866 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9016 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.571 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.571 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S09016 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10028