NY A10023 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the commissioner of education to establish rules and regulations for a sepsis awareness and prevention program for school districts, boards of cooperative educational services and nonpublic schools.
Title
Relates to directing the commissioner of education to establish rules and regulations for a sepsis awareness and prevention program for school districts, boards of cooperative educational services and nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.720 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08061 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES