NY A10013 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies requirements for motor fuel advertising media; requires clearly visible signs relating to the pricing of motor fuels.
Title
Specifies requirements for motor fuel advertising media; requires clearly visible signs relating to the pricing of motor fuels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.300 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.300 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
A09548 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - enacting clause stricken
S07548 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
S07548 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION