NY A09994 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that restaurants only provide single-use plastic straws to customers when explicitly requested by the customer or when selected by the consumer from a self-service dispenser.
Title
Requires that restaurants only provide single-use plastic straws to customers when explicitly requested by the customer or when selected by the consumer from a self-service dispenser.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 9994b |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 9994a |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08726 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - PRINT NUMBER 8726B