NY A09993 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9310
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9310
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the City of Troy to lease sub-surface park land property referred to as Riverfront Park for district geothermal wells and distribution lines.
Title
Authorizes the City of Troy to lease sub-surface park land property referred to as Riverfront Park for district geothermal wells and distribution lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9310 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.632 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.632 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | print number 9993a |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S09310 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.547