NY A09981 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.467
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.467
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duties of the division of veterans' affairs concerning information about veterans received from nursing homes and residential health care facilities, including assisted living facilities and assisted living residences and adult care facilities.
Title
Relates to the duties of the division of veterans' affairs concerning information about veterans received from nursing homes and residential health care facilities, including assisted living facilities and assisted living residences and adult care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | signed chap.467 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2131 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8968 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9981a |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.818 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S08968 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9981A