NY A09976 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law relating to publishers or manufacturers providing printed instructional materials for college students with disabilities.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law relating to publishers or manufacturers providing printed instructional materials for college students with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.283 |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1249 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8945 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.94 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08945 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9976