NY A09974 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires general hospitals and ambulatory surgery facilities to adopt and implement policies to prevent exposure to by-products generated from the use of an energy generating surgical device, including, but not limited to, surgical plume, smoke plume, bio-aerosols, laser-generated airborne contaminants, and lung damaging dust through use of an airborne contaminant evacuation system.
Title
Requires general hospitals and ambulatory surgery facilities to adopt and implement policies to prevent exposure to by-products generated from the use of an energy generating surgical device, including, but not limited to, surgical plume, smoke plume, bio-aerosols, laser-generated airborne contaminants, and lung damaging dust through use of an airborne contaminant evacuation system.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | signed chap.701 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1461 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8869 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.253 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.253 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08869 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9974