NY A09971 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the provision of physical therapy assistant services by physical therapy assistants.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the provision of physical therapy assistant services by physical therapy assistants.
Sponsors
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.281 |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1247 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8843A |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.640 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08843 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9971