NY A09969 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes provisions of law relating to members, directors and officers to align with current practices, streamline procedures and eliminate unnecessary regulatory burdens.
Title
Modernizes provisions of law relating to members, directors and officers to align with current practices, streamline procedures and eliminate unnecessary regulatory burdens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.614 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1825 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9047 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.639 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S09047 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9969